AL HB27 | 2015 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-06 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-06 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Legislative Committee on Government Oversight and Accountability, created, membership, powers and duties, Sec. 41-19-10 am'd.
Title
Joint Legislative Committee on Government Oversight and Accountability, created, membership, powers and duties, Sec. 41-19-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. John Knight [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2015-08-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 18 |
2015-08-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-08-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-08-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |