AL HB269 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Class 1, 3, 4, and 5 municipalities, establishment of entertainment districts authorized, Act 2012-438, 2012 Reg Sess., am'd; Sec. 28-3A-17.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Class 1, 3, 4, and 5 municipalities, establishment of entertainment districts authorized, Act 2012-438, 2012 Reg Sess., am'd; Sec. 28-3A-17.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - House - Williams (P) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Ford motion to Table (Y: 17 N: 45 NV: 8 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - House - Ford motion to Adopt (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Williams (P) motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Williams (P) motion to Adopt (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20SenateDelivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20SenateAssigned Act No. 2013-382.
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20HouseWilliams (P) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1261
2013-05-20HouseConcurrence Requested
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1115
2013-05-20SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1114
2013-05-20SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2013-05-20SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1113
2013-05-20SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-30SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-04-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2013-04-04HouseEngrossed
2013-04-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 268
2013-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 267
2013-04-04HouseBlack Amendment Offered
2013-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 266
2013-04-04HouseRogers Amendment Offered
2013-04-04HouseNordgren motion to Reconsider Withdrawn
2013-04-04HouseWilliams (P) motion to Table Nordgren motion to reconsider lost Roll Call 265
2013-04-04HouseNordgren motion to Reconsider Ford amendment offered
2013-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 264
2013-04-04HouseFord Amendment Offered
2013-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 263
2013-04-04HouseEconomic Development and Tourism Amendment #2 Offered
2013-04-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 262
2013-04-04HouseEconomic Development and Tourism Amendment #1 Offered
2013-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-02-28HouseReported from Economic Development and Tourism as Favorable with 2 amendments
2013-02-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB269
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB269-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB269-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB269-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=462737&VOTE=262&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=462739&VOTE=263&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=462749&VOTE=264&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=462765&VOTE=265&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=462889&VOTE=266&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=462893&VOTE=267&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=462894&VOTE=268&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476094&VOTE=1113&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476096&VOTE=1114&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476097&VOTE=1115&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476659&VOTE=1261&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback