AL HB268 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Conference Committee on HB268 2016RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Definition of Moral Turpitude Act, established, crimes which disqualify citizens from voting provided, Sec. 17-3-30.1 added; Secs. 17-4-3, 17-4-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definition of Moral Turpitude Act, established, crimes which disqualify citizens from voting provided, Sec. 17-3-30.1 added; Secs. 17-4-3, 17-4-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Jones motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 73 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 79 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseConference Committee on HB268 2016RS first Substitute Offered
2016-05-04HouseJones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 889
2016-05-04HouseConference Report
2016-05-04HouseConference Committee Appointed
2016-05-04SenateMarsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 980 P&PO appoints Ward, Williams, Phil and Smitherman
2016-05-04SenateConference Committee Requested
2016-05-03HouseJones motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 832 House appoints House appoints Jones, England and Hill (J)
2016-05-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 949
2016-05-03SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 948
2016-05-03SenateWard Amendment Offered
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-05-03SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-03SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 934
2016-05-03SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-27SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-04-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2016-04-19HouseEngrossed
2016-04-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 636
2016-04-19HouseHolmes (A) motion to Carry Over Temporarily lost Voice Vote 635
2016-04-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 634
2016-04-19HouseEngland Amendment Offered
2016-04-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-22HouseJones motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 332
2016-03-22HouseJones Amendment Offered
2016-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 331
2016-03-22HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2016-03-22HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-02-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB268
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB268-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=541865&VOTE=331&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=541868&VOTE=332&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546602&VOTE=635&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546602&VOTE=634&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546953&VOTE=635&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546953&VOTE=636&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551319&VOTE=934&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551413&VOTE=948&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551414&VOTE=949&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551469&VOTE=832&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551900&VOTE=980&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552403&VOTE=889&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback