AL HB267 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., alcoholic beverage, Sunday sales, muns. and co. authorized to commence at 10:00 a.m.
Title
Mobile Co., alcoholic beverage, Sunday sales, muns. and co. authorized to commence at 10:00 a.m.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018. |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-227. |
2018-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 559 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County |
2018-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 285 |
2018-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |