AL HB267 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Assigned Act No. 2011-556 on 06/09/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Assigned Act No. 2011-556 on 06/09/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Title insurers, closing or settlement insurance for settlement agents, issuance authorized, Sec. 27-3-6.1 added
Title
Title insurers, closing or settlement insurance for settlement agents, issuance authorized, Sec. 27-3-6.1 added
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-556 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 969 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-07 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 215 | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |