AL HB265 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal planning commission, adopt regulations authorizing administrative approval of minor subdivisions without notice and a public hearing under certain conditions, Sec. 11-52-31 am'd.
Title
Municipal planning commission, adopt regulations authorizing administrative approval of minor subdivisions without notice and a public hearing under certain conditions, Sec. 11-52-31 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Wingo [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Wingo motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Wingo motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 1:25 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-460. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-04 | House | Wingo motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1268 |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1435 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1434 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 385 |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |