AL HB264 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Human trafficking, revise penalties and establish agencies responsible for enforcement, Sec. 13A-6-170 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking, revise penalties and establish agencies responsible for enforcement, Sec. 13A-6-170 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateFurther Consideration
2019-05-31SenateWard motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-31SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
2019-05-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-05-22HouseEngrossed
2019-05-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 882
2019-05-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 881
2019-05-22HouseColeman Amendment Offered
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB264&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB264-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB264-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201869-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202186-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202143-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202138-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=622125&VOTE=881&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=622126&VOTE=882&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback