AL HB262 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prostitution, to allow disclosure of certain person's picture after being arrested, Sec. 13A-6-183 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution, to allow disclosure of certain person's picture after being arrested, Sec. 13A-6-183 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - Coleman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:26 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
2019-05-31HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-31SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled
2019-05-31SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-31HouseColeman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1285
2019-05-31HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-31SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1478
2019-05-31SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1477
2019-05-31SenateMelson Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-31SenateWard motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-05-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 879
2019-05-22HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 878
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB262&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB262-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202380-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=622112&VOTE=878&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=622117&VOTE=879&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627931&VOTE=1477&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627932&VOTE=1478&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627996&VOTE=1285&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback