AL HB262 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child custody, military deployment not sole factor in determination in original order or modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child custody, military deployment not sole factor in determination in original order or modification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-366.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-03HouseEnrolled
2015-06-03HousePassed Second House
2015-06-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1402
2015-06-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-21SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 895
2015-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-04-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-12HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback