AL HB262 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Capital offenses, defendant's guilty plea, state to prove guilt only when death penalty to be imposed, guilty plea to waive all non-jurisdictional defects in cases where death penalty or life without parole to be imposed, Sec. 13A-5-42 am'd.
Title
Capital offenses, defendant's guilty plea, state to prove guilt only when death penalty to be imposed, guilty plea to waive all non-jurisdictional defects in cases where death penalty or life without parole to be imposed, Sec. 13A-5-42 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-354. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1128 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 847 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 706 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 964 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 963 |
2013-04-25 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |