AL HB262 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governmental Affairs first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governmental Affairs first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Department, prison industries, sale of products further provided for, operation of joint venture with private businesses, authorized, Secs. 14-7-7, 14-7-22 am'd.
Title
Corrections Department, prison industries, sale of products further provided for, operation of joint venture with private businesses, authorized, Secs. 14-7-7, 14-7-22 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governmental Affairs first Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-02 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Governmental Affairs with 1 amendment | |
2011-06-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-31 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 991 | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 990 | |
2011-05-31 | Holmes Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 989 | |
2011-05-31 | DeMarco Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |