AL HB261 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to two-year and four-year public institutions of higher education; to amend Section 16-1-52, Code of Alabama 1975, to prohibit a biological male from participating on an athletic team or sport designated for females; to prohibit a biological female from participating on an athletic team or sport designated for males; to prohibit adverse action against a public K-12 school or public two-year or four-year institution of higher education for complying with this act; to prohibit adverse action or retaliation against a student who reports a violation of this act; and to provide a remedy for any student who suffers harm or is directy deprived of an athletic opportunity as a result of a violation of this act.
Title
Relating to two-year and four-year public institutions of higher education; to amend Section 16-1-52, Code of Alabama 1975, to prohibit a biological male from participating on an athletic team or sport designated for females; to prohibit a biological female from participating on an athletic team or sport designated for males; to prohibit adverse action against a public K-12 school or public two-year or four-year institution of higher education for complying with this act; to prohibit adverse action or retaliation against a student who reports a violation of this act; and to provide a remedy for any student who suffers harm or is directy deprived of an athletic opportunity as a result of a violation of this act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Adopt JR3UYN-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Adopt A15GS7-1 (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Table KY9S5U-1 (Y: 80 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Adopt JR3UYN-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Adopt A15GS7-1 (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Table KY9S5U-1 (Y: 80 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Adopt JR3UYN-1 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Education Policy |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Education Policy JR3UYN-1 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Education Policy |
2023-04-19 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-18 | House | Add Cosponsor |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-18 | House | Adopt A15GS7-1 |
2023-04-18 | House | Table KY9S5U-1 |
2023-04-18 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Education Policy |
2023-04-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Education Policy |
2023-04-05 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |