AL HB261 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, exported oil and transmix exempt from license fee, definitions clarified, K-1 kerosene and aviation jet fuel refined in state exempt from motor fuel tax, Secs. 40-17-174, 40-17-322, 40-17-329, 40-17-340, 40-17-362 am'd.
Title
Taxation, exported oil and transmix exempt from license fee, definitions clarified, K-1 kerosene and aviation jet fuel refined in state exempt from motor fuel tax, Secs. 40-17-174, 40-17-322, 40-17-329, 40-17-340, 40-17-362 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Greg Burdine [D] | Rep. Kurt Wallace [R] | Rep. Allen Treadaway [R] |
Sen. April Weaver [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Mike Hill [R] | Rep. Alan Harper [R] |
Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Lesley Vance [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Baker motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Baker motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-372. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 307 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2013-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2013-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 216 |
2013-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 215 |
2013-03-19 | House | Baker Amendment Offered |
2013-03-19 | House | Baker motion to Table adopted Roll Call 214 |
2013-03-19 | House | Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |