AL HB261 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Capital offenses, sex crimes, certain against children included, sentencing to life imprisonment without parole, Sec. 13A-5-6 am'd. (2011-20458)
Title
Capital offenses, sex crimes, certain against children included, sentencing to life imprisonment without parole, Sec. 13A-5-6 am'd. (2011-20458)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 8:40 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-555 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1005 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Cosponsors Added | |
2011-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 454 | |
2011-04-21 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 453 | |
2011-04-21 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2011-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-22 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |