AL HB26 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Re-referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, smoking of tobacco products prohibited in vehicle with minor present

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, smoking of tobacco products prohibited in vehicle with minor present

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateRe-referred to Committee on County and Municipal Government
2018-02-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-30HouseJones intended to vote "Nay"
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 143
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback