AL HB259 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Police animals, search and rescue animals, fire detection and protection animals, criminal penalties for harassing, interfering, taunting, attacking, or entering containment area of, restitution, Sec. 13A-11-15 repealed
Title
Police animals, search and rescue animals, fire detection and protection animals, criminal penalties for harassing, interfering, taunting, attacking, or entering containment area of, restitution, Sec. 13A-11-15 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-421. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1212 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 984 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |