AL HB258 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General, opinions, distribution of electronic copies by e-mail in lieu of paper copies, posting on Internet required, Sec. 36-15-1 am'd.
Title
Attorney General, opinions, distribution of electronic copies by e-mail in lieu of paper copies, posting on Internet required, Sec. 36-15-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-695 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1196 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2010-01-28 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 156 | |
2010-01-28 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |