AL HB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distinctive tag program, to include private two-year colleges and technical schools, Revenue Dept, authorized to review personalized tags, appeals of denials, annual tag registration fees, distribution of fees on electric motor vehicles to counties and muns., use regulated, Sec. 32-6-67 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, distinctive tag program, to include private two-year colleges and technical schools, Revenue Dept, authorized to review personalized tags, appeals of denials, annual tag registration fees, distribution of fees on electric motor vehicles to counties and muns., use regulated, Sec. 32-6-67 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-305. |
2019-05-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-22 | House | Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 884 |
2019-05-22 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 797 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 796 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Gudger Amendment Offered |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Gudger motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-04-18 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 285 |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 284 |
2019-04-18 | House | Shedd Amendment Offered |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |