AL HB257 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Interagency Council for the Prevention of Elder Abuse, established, members, duties, subject to Sunset Law, reports to Chief Justice of Supreme Court, Governor, and Legislature, Elder Abuse Prevention Act
Title
Interagency Council for the Prevention of Elder Abuse, established, members, duties, subject to Sunset Law, reports to Chief Justice of Supreme Court, Governor, and Legislature, Elder Abuse Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher England [D] | Sen. Tammy Irons [D] | Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. John Robinson [D] |
Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-16 | Cosponsors Added | |
2010-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 260 | |
2010-02-16 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 259 | |
2010-02-16 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-19 | Rereferred from GA to Judy | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations |