AL HB256 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to labor and employement; to exclude consideration of a motor carrier's use of safety improvements, technologies, practices, and driver coaching in determining a motor carrier driver's classification as an independent contractor or an employee under state law.
Title
Relating to labor and employement; to exclude consideration of a motor carrier's use of safety improvements, technologies, practices, and driver coaching in determining a motor carrier driver's classification as an independent contractor or an employee under state law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Adopt PZOIGE-1 (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Adopt PZOIGE-1 (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-04-25 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-20 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopt PZOIGE-1 |
2023-04-20 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Commerce and Small Business PZOIGE-1 |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Commerce and Small Business |
2023-04-05 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Commerce and Small Business O26EWJ-1 |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Commerce and Small Business |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |