AL HB256 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 6, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 6, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal Audit Clarification Act, annual or biennial audit or annual report in lieu of audit, based on annual expenditures of municipality, Sec. 11-43-85 am'd.
Title
Municipal Audit Clarification Act, annual or biennial audit or annual report in lieu of audit, based on annual expenditures of municipality, Sec. 11-43-85 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 955 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 954 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 628 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Chestnut motion to Adopt Roll Call 627 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 954 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 628 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - HBIR: Chestnut motion to Adopt Roll Call 627 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 6, 2022. |
2022-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-345. |
2022-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 955 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 628 |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Rereferred from C&MG to SG |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |