AL HB255 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 2:26 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 2:26 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senior Services Dept., advisory board of directors, designees authorized to attend meetings on behalf of an ex officio member, additional board member, Sec. 38-3-1 am'd.
Title
Senior Services Dept., advisory board of directors, designees authorized to attend meetings on behalf of an ex officio member, additional board member, Sec. 38-3-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1173 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1383 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 1382 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 1381 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 245 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 244 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1383 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 1382 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - SBIR: McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 1381 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 245 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - HBIR: Shedd motion to Adopt Roll Call 244 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:26 p.m. on May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-484. |
2021-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-05-17 | House | Shedd motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1173 |
2021-05-17 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1383 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | McClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1382 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | McClendon Amendment Offered |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services |
2021-03-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 245 |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |