AL HB255 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:21 p.m. on May 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:21 p.m. on May 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lawrence Co., service of process fee, increased, service for out-of-state documents, fee provided for, distribution
Title
Lawrence Co., service of process fee, increased, service for out-of-state documents, fee provided for, distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:21 p.m. on May 7, 2020. |
2020-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-181. |
2020-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 538 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 94 |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |