AL HB255 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adult Protective Services Act, revise definition of protected person, to persons with Alzheimers disease or dementia and remove reference to senile, Sec. 38-9-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult Protective Services Act, revise definition of protected person, to persons with Alzheimers disease or dementia and remove reference to senile, Sec. 38-9-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseForwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseForwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseJudiciary first Amendment Offered
2018-03-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-564.
2018-03-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-27HouseEnrolled
2018-03-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-27HousePassed Second House
2018-03-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1196
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 714
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 713
2018-03-13HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback