AL HB255 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Unfair or deceptive trade practices, by certain new vehicle manufacturers and distributors, to exempt certain manufacturers and distributors of certain engines for certain weight, Sec. 8-20-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unfair or deceptive trade practices, by certain new vehicle manufacturers and distributors, to exempt certain manufacturers and distributors of certain engines for certain weight, Sec. 8-20-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-357.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-03HouseEnrolled
2016-05-03HousePassed Second House
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 926
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
2016-03-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433
2016-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback