AL HB255 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 12:55 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Delivered to Governor at 12:55 p.m. on March 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., county officers, credit card payments, fee required to cover costs, Act 99-651, 1999 2nd Sp. Sess. am'd.
Title
Mobile Co., county officers, credit card payments, fee required to cover costs, Act 99-651, 1999 2nd Sp. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Rep. James Ison [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Delivered to Governor at 12:55 p.m. on March 25, 2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned Act No. 2010-268. | |
2010-03-25 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Signature Requested | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Second House | |
2010-03-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 573 | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 3 | |
2010-02-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 215 | |
2010-02-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |