AL HB254 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Elections, Secretary of State authorized to share voter lists with other states free of charge, state agencies and Dept. of Public Safety to provide information and data to Secretary of State to maintain voter registration database, Sec. 17-4-38 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, Secretary of State authorized to share voter lists with other states free of charge, state agencies and Dept. of Public Safety to provide information and data to Secretary of State to maintain voter registration database, Sec. 17-4-38 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Ainsworth motion to Table (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
2015-06-04HouseEngrossed
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-459.
2015-06-04House
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04HouseEnrolled
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-04HousePassed Second House
2015-06-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1465
2015-06-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-06-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-06-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Ethics and Elections
2015-04-21HouseEngrossed
2015-04-21HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 439
2015-04-21HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 438
2015-04-21HouseAinsworth 2nd Amendment Offered
2015-04-21HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 437
2015-04-21HouseAinsworth 1st Amendment Offered
2015-04-21HouseAinsworth motion to Table adopted Roll Call 436
2015-04-21HouseConstitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment
2015-04-21HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB254
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB254-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB254-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB254-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=512135&VOTE=436&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=512137&VOTE=437&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=512139&VOTE=438&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=512140&VOTE=439&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526373&VOTE=1465&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback