AL HB253 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to taxation; to amend Sections 40-9F-31, 40-9F-33, and 40-9F-38, Code of Alabama 1975; to further provide certain age restrictions for structures to qualify for tax credits; to allow rehabilitation credits to be tied to the year in which the reservation is allocated; to provide for additional rehabilitation credit allocations; to further provide for the membership of the Historic Tax Credit Evaluating Committee and the factors considered by the committee; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Title
Relating to taxation; to amend Sections 40-9F-31, 40-9F-33, and 40-9F-38, Code of Alabama 1975; to further provide certain age restrictions for structures to qualify for tax credits; to allow rehabilitation credits to be tied to the year in which the reservation is allocated; to provide for additional rehabilitation credit allocations; to further provide for the membership of the Historic Tax Credit Evaluating Committee and the factors considered by the committee; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Adopt YVQCN2-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Adopt P4N6GE-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt MPG711-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Adopt YVQCN2-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Adopt P4N6GE-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt MPG711-1 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | House | Enacted |
2023-06-06 | House | Enrolled |
2023-06-06 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Adopt YVQCN2-1 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Adopt P4N6GE-1 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Finance and Taxation Education P4N6GE-1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-09 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-09 | House | Adopt MPG711-1 |
2023-05-09 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education MPG711-1 |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education 5EPCM6-1 |
2023-05-03 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education YYFT62-1 |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |