AL HB253 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighters and rescue squad members, income tax credit for training under certain conditions
Title
Firefighters and rescue squad members, income tax credit for training under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Bedsole motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1025 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1083 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1082 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 355 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 354 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Bedsole motion to Table Roll Call 353 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Bedsole motion to Adopt Roll Call 352 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1083 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 1082 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 355 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 354 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Bedsole motion to Table Roll Call 353 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Bedsole motion to Adopt Roll Call 352 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-298. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | House | Bedsole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1025 |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1083 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1082 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 355 |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 354 |
2022-02-24 | House | Bedsole Amendment Offered |
2022-02-24 | House | Bedsole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 353 |
2022-02-24 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |