AL HB251 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan, certain contributions to savings accounts by guardians and conservators, authorized, Sec. 16-33C-25 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wallace-Folsom Savings Investment Plan, certain contributions to savings accounts by guardians and conservators, authorized, Sec. 16-33C-25 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseForwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
2018-03-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-280.
2018-03-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-15SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-15SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled
2018-03-15HouseJohnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 802
2018-03-15HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 778
2018-03-13SenateBlackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 777
2018-03-13SenateBrewbaker first Substitute Offered
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-06SenateBrewbaker motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-06SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-02-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
2018-02-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258
2018-02-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback