AL HB251 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Water, sewer, and fire protection authorities, fire protection service, definition to include additional activities such as testing or drilling for water, Sec. 11-88-1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water, sewer, and fire protection authorities, fire protection service, definition to include additional activities such as testing or drilling for water, Sec. 11-88-1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseForwarded to Governor
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-334.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20HousePassed Second House
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1112
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-09SenateMarsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1013
2013-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-05-02SenateBussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 705
2013-05-02SenateSmitherman motion to rerefer
2013-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
2013-04-25HouseEngrossed
2013-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 866
2013-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 865
2013-04-25HouseCounty and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2013-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2013-02-12HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB251
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB251-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB251-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB251-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=469885&VOTE=865&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=469886&VOTE=866&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471990&VOTE=705&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475129&VOTE=1013&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476090&VOTE=1112&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback