AL HB249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income taxes, tax deduction for contributions to an ABLE savings account extended
Title
Income taxes, tax deduction for contributions to an ABLE savings account extended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 559 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 559 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |