AL HB249 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, Alabama Move Over Act, garbage, trash, refuse, or recycling collection vehicles included, Sec. 32-5A-58.2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, Alabama Move Over Act, garbage, trash, refuse, or recycling collection vehicles included, Sec. 32-5A-58.2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-400.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20HousePassed Second House
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-04-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
2013-04-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 296
2013-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-03-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-12HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback