AL HB247 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Co. commissions, purchasing, use of credit or debit cards, rebates distrib. to co. general fund
Title
Co. commissions, purchasing, use of credit or debit cards, rebates distrib. to co. general fund
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Harper [R] | Rep. Steve McMillan [R] | Rep. Mike Hill [R] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Rep. Berry Forte [D] | Rep. Stephen Hurst [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Harper motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Harper motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-211. |
2013-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | House | Harper motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1077 |
2013-05-02 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 816 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 815 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-09 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364 |
2013-04-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 363 |
2013-04-09 | House | County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |