AL HB246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, grades K-12, yoga, authorize local boards of education to offer to students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, grades K-12, yoga, authorize local boards of education to offer to students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 387 (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - HBIR: Gray motion to Adopt Roll Call 386 (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenatePending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Judiciary
2021-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2021-03-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 387
2021-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB246&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB246-int.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41862.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42433.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41976.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=651443&VOTE=386&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB246&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=651447&VOTE=387&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback