AL HB246 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Transportation and Energy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Transportation and Energy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Railroad crossing, requirement to stop, approach of other on-track equipment covered, Secs. 32-5A-150, 32-5A-151, 32-5A-152 am'd.
Title
Railroad crossing, requirement to stop, approach of other on-track equipment covered, Secs. 32-5A-150, 32-5A-151, 32-5A-152 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Transportation and Energy |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 230 |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |