AL HB243 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Dept, competitive bids, min. requirement increased for projects over $250,000, Sec. 39-2-2 am'd.
Title
Transportation Dept, competitive bids, min. requirement increased for projects over $250,000, Sec. 39-2-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sells [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-199. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018. |
2018-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 581 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 256 |
2018-02-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 255 |
2018-02-08 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2018-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |