AL HB242 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use taxes, exemption for sale of fruit and agricultural products further provided for, all sales tax exemptions incorporated in use tax, Secs. 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.
Title
Sales and use taxes, exemption for sale of fruit and agricultural products further provided for, all sales tax exemptions incorporated in use tax, Secs. 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-562. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1200 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 387 |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | Rereferred from Ways and Means Education to Agriculture and Forestry |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |