AL HB242 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Third Reading Received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Workers' compensation, exemptions, persons exempted, Sec. 25-5-50 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation, exemptions, persons exempted, Sec. 25-5-50 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Received
2017-05-17HouseForwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m.
2017-05-17HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-390.
2017-05-17HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-17HouseEnrolled
2017-05-17SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-17HousePassed Second House
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1176
2017-05-17SenateOrr motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1168
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-05-17SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-04-20SenateReported from Banking and Insurance as Favorable
2017-04-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
2017-04-06HouseEngrossed
2017-04-06HouseColeman intended to vot e"Yea"
2017-04-06HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 428
2017-04-06HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 427
2017-04-06HouseCommerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
2017-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback