AL HB240 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-19 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-19 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to economic development; to add Section 40-18-379.1 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to require the Department of Commerce to publish certain information regarding economic development incentives awarded under the Alabama Jobs Act.
Title
Relating to economic development; to add Section 40-18-379.1 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to require the Department of Commerce to publish certain information regarding economic development incentives awarded under the Alabama Jobs Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development D197HT-1 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-04-13 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-13 | House | Add Cosponsor |
2023-04-13 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-13 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |