AL HB24 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Judiciary first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing standards, to provide for resentencing of certain individuals convicted of nonviolent offenses, procedure for resentencing, Sec. 12-25-34.3 added.
Title
Sentencing standards, to provide for resentencing of certain individuals convicted of nonviolent offenses, procedure for resentencing, Sec. 12-25-34.3 added.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 33 (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 32 (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 32 (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33 |
2021-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |