AL HB24 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parental rights, blind individuals, blindness may not serve as a basis for denial or restriction of visitation or custody
Title
Parental rights, blind individuals, blindness may not serve as a basis for denial or restriction of visitation or custody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019. |
2019-05-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-274. |
2019-05-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 947 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-23 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 354 |
2019-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 353 |
2019-04-23 | House | Hollis first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy |