AL HB24 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Delivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Child Placing Agency Inclusion Act, state prohibited from discriminating against child care service providers based on religious beliefs, civil remedies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Placing Agency Inclusion Act, state prohibited from discriminating against child care service providers based on religious beliefs, civil remedies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - Wingo motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Hightower motion to Table (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Hightower motion to Table (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Hightower motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Members intended to cosponsor (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 71) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on April 27, 2017.
2017-04-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-213.
2017-04-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-04-27SenateSignature Requested
2017-04-27SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-04-25HouseEnrolled
2017-04-25HouseWingo motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 621
2017-04-25HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-04-18SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 650
2017-04-18SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 649
2017-04-18SenateHightower motion to Table adopted Roll Call 648
2017-04-18SenateRoss Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateHightower motion to Table adopted Roll Call 647
2017-04-18SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateHightower motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 646
2017-04-18SenateHealth and Human Services Amendment Offered
2017-04-18SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-03-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2017-03-16HouseMembers intended to cosponsor
2017-03-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 336
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB24&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB24-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185100-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185505-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/185516-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=565653&VOTE=336&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=565656&VOTE=337&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569613&VOTE=646&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569616&VOTE=647&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569620&VOTE=648&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569621&VOTE=649&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569622&VOTE=650&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571104&VOTE=621&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback