AL HB24 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United Ways of Alabama, authorized to participate in state health insurance coverage, Sec. 36-29-14 am'd.
Title
United Ways of Alabama, authorized to participate in state health insurance coverage, Sec. 36-29-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Banking and Insurance | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 615 | |
2011-05-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |