AL HB239 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Industrial Development Authority, members, composition altered to include President Pro Tempore of Senate or designee and Speaker of the House or designee, Sec. 41-10-25 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Development Authority, members, composition altered to include President Pro Tempore of Senate or designee and Speaker of the House or designee, Sec. 41-10-25 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-19 - House - Merrill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-512.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1567
2012-05-16 Reed Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2012-05-16 House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2012-05-16 Merrill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1573
2012-05-16 Executive Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Forwarded to Governor
2012-05-09 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-09 Signature Requested
2012-05-09 Enrolled
2012-05-09 Passed Second House
2012-05-08 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1210
2012-05-08 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2012-05-08 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-03-22 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2012-04-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-22 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 441
2012-03-22 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-09 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB239
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB239-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB239-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=433179&VOTE=441&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=446761&VOTE=1210&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450279&VOTE=1573&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451008&VOTE=1567&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback