AL HB238 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children, criminal penalties for distrib. of harmful material to minor by school employee, out of court statements by minors allowed under certain conditions, certain individuals with certain credentials auth. to work in child care facilities, criminal penaties for sexual abuse by foster parents, Sec. 38-7-20 added; Secs. 13A-12-200.5, 15-25-31, 26-14-3, 38-7-2 am'd.
Title
Children, criminal penalties for distrib. of harmful material to minor by school employee, out of court statements by minors allowed under certain conditions, certain individuals with certain credentials auth. to work in child care facilities, criminal penaties for sexual abuse by foster parents, Sec. 38-7-20 added; Secs. 13A-12-200.5, 15-25-31, 26-14-3, 38-7-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-354. |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 963 |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-23 | House | Engrossed |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 430 |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 429 |
2016-03-23 | House | Collins Amendment Offered |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |