AL HB238 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:30 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Nursing facilities, supplemental privilege assessment and monthly surcharge extended, expiration under certain conditions, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing facilities, supplemental privilege assessment and monthly surcharge extended, expiration under certain conditions, Sec. 40-26B-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:30 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
2015-06-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-458.
2015-06-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-06-04HouseEnrolled
2015-06-04SenateSignature Requested
2015-06-04HousePassed Second House
2015-06-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1441
2015-06-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-05-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-19HouseEngrossed
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 831
2015-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 830
2015-05-19HouseClouse Amendment Offered
2015-05-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB238
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB238-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB238-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB238-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519177&VOTE=830&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519178&VOTE=831&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526075&VOTE=1441&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback