AL HB238 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judge of probate, estates, bond of conservators, executors, administrators, liability limited unless grossly negligent, judicial immunity further provided for, Secs. 26-3-13, 43-2-82 am'd.
Title
Judge of probate, estates, bond of conservators, executors, administrators, liability limited unless grossly negligent, judicial immunity further provided for, Secs. 26-3-13, 43-2-82 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. David Standridge [R] | Rep. Randall Shedd [R] | Rep. Kurt Wallace [R] | Rep. Johnny Morrow [D] |
Rep. Charles Newton [D] | Rep. Elaine Beech [D] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 613 |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |