AL HB237 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Healthcare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, physicians, duty of care owed to babies born alive after failed abortion, criminal penalties, definitions further provided

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, physicians, duty of care owed to babies born alive after failed abortion, criminal penalties, definitions further provided

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 485 (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 484 (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 483 (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 482 (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - HBIR: Shaver motion to Adopt Roll Call 481 (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenatePending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Healthcare
2021-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
2021-03-18HouseEngrossed
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 485
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 484
2021-03-18HouseJudiciary 2nd Amendment Offered
2021-03-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 483
2021-03-18HouseLedbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 482
2021-03-18HouseJudiciary 1st Amendment Offered
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2021-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB237&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB237-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB237-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210641-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210877-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41897.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42006.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42621.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653162&VOTE=481&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB237&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653221&VOTE=482&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653236&VOTE=483&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653237&VOTE=484&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=653238&VOTE=485&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback