AL HB237 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grandparents, visitation with grandchildren, petition procedure and burden of proof established, Sec. 30-3-4.1 repealed
Title
Grandparents, visitation with grandchildren, petition procedure and burden of proof established, Sec. 30-3-4.1 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Shiver motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | |
2015-06-04 | House | Shiver motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1287 House appoints Shiver, Jones and Hall |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1433 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1432 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Brewbaker Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1431 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1430 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Bussman Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 508 |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 507 |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 506 |
2015-04-23 | House | JUDY 2nd Amendment Offered |
2015-04-23 | House | JUDY 1st Amendment Offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2015-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |